Hayes v. Smith et al

Plaintiff: Joy Veronica Hayes
Defendant: Theresa Smith and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2015cv04010
Filed: January 16, 2015
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 23, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; re 28 Report and Recommendations; claims against State Farm be dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 23, 2015. (cnn)
May 27, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 19 Report and Recommendations; granting 7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's claims against Separate Defendant Theresa Smith are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 27, 2015. (mll)
May 6, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 11 Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Answer. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on May 6, 2015. (mll)
January 27, 2015 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting 3 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Theresa Smith, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Defendant is to answer within 21 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 27, 2015. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service) (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayes v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy Veronica Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?