Zurich American Insurance Company v. Fikes Truck Line, LLC

Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company
Defendant: Fikes Truck Line, LLC
Case Number: 4:2015cv04019
Filed: February 13, 2015
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Hempstead
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 15, 2016 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 68 Motion for Order to Garnishee BancorpSouth Bank. Upon payment, BancorpSouth shall be discharged from all liability on Plaintiff's Writ of Garnishment. (See Order for specifics.) Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 15, 2016. (mll)
May 10, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 53 Motion for Contempt. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on May 9, 2016. (mll)
March 28, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 Motion for Order to Garnishee; granting 59 Motion for Order to Garnishee Hope Water & Light Company. (See Order for specifics.) Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 28, 2016. (mll)
January 20, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 Motion to Compel. Responses to post-judgment discovery requests due by February 15, 2016. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 20, 2016. (mll)
January 7, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 30 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 7, 2016. (mll)
October 29, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Joint Motion for Judgment. Parties settled, case is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to terms of settlement agreement. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 29, 2015. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zurich American Insurance Company v. Fikes Truck Line, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Luke K. Burton
Represented By: Andrew King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fikes Truck Line, LLC
Represented By: Cynthia W. Kolb
Represented By: Joseph E. Jess Sweere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?