Hampton v. Brazell et al
Plaintiff: Bobby Joe Hampton
Defendant: Marty Brazell, Golden Adams, Byron Griffie, James Ramsey, Sergeant Moon and Miller County Medical Staff
Case Number: 4:2015cv04037
Filed: April 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 50 ; granting 28 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 3, 2016. (mll)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER directing issuance of subpoena to Bi-State Detention Center requesting production of all medical records for Plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on February 11, 2016. (mll)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying 6 Motion for Order; denying 13 Motion to Compel; denying 20 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena; granting in part 25 Motion to Compel; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE for Defendants' failure to obey the Order of the Court. (Show Cause Response due by 1/25/2016.) Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 14, 2016. (mll)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMENDED ORDER re 16 First MOTION to Substitute Attorney Jason E. Owens for Colin P. Wall filed by Sergeant Moon, Marty Brazell. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on August 7, 2015. (mll)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 9 Report and Recommendations. Defendants James Ramsey, Golden Adams and Byron Griffie terminated. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 16, 2015. (mll)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hampton v. Brazell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Joe Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Brazell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byron Griffie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller County Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?