Mercer v. Martin et al

Plaintiff: Todd H. Mercer
Defendant: Danny Martin, Patricia Franklin and Miller
Case Number: 4:2015cv04052
Filed: June 11, 2015
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Nevada
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting IFP, directing Clerk to assess filing fee and collect funds from Prison Account of Todd H. Mercer. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on August 30, 2016. (mll)
August 8, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT granting 35 Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing case with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on August 8, 2016. (mll)
March 2, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 29 Motion to Compel; denying 32 Motion to Compel. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on March 2, 2016. (mll)
January 7, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 Motion to Issue Order; granting 23 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion to Re-Issue Order; granting 26 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nicholas Rudolph Windle withdrawn and the Clerk of Court is directed to remove his name from the list of attorneys who receive Notices of Electronic Filing in this case. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 7, 2016. (mll)
October 1, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion for Order to Subpoena Documents. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 1, 2015. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mercer v. Martin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd H. Mercer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?