Texarkana Arkansas School District v. T.R

Plaintiff: Texarkana Arkansas School District
Defendant: T.R.
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Kimberly Randles and Reginald Randles
Thirdparty_defendant: Texarkana School District, Becky Kesler and Sherry Young
Case Number: 4:2015cv04101
Filed: October 7, 2015
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 20:1400 Civil Rights of Handicapped Child
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Motion to Tender Administrative Record. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 31, 2016. (mll)
August 25, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Motion to Stay Consideration of District's Motion for Summary Judgment. Jury trial of October 17, 2016 canceled. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 25, 2016. (mll)
June 8, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 20 Motion to Compel. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on June 8, 2016. (mll)
May 18, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing parties to meet and confer re supplemented discovery responses to determine the discovery responses still at issue re 20 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Texarkana Arkansas School District. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on May 18, 2016. (mll)
December 22, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 16 ; denying 9 Motion to Remand. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 22, 2015. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Texarkana Arkansas School District v. T.R
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texarkana Arkansas School District
Represented By: George J. Bequette, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.R.
Represented By: Theresa L. Caldwell
Represented By: Kitty L. Cone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Kimberly Randles
Represented By: Theresa L. Caldwell
Represented By: Kitty L. Cone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Reginald Randles
Represented By: Theresa L. Caldwell
Represented By: Kitty L. Cone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Texarkana School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Becky Kesler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Sherry Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?