Quadri v. The United States

Plaintiff: Taofeek A. Quadri
Defendant: The United States
Case Number: 4:2016cv04003
Filed: January 5, 2016
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 25, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 20 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Taofeek A. Quadri. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 25, 2017. (mll)
November 23, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in part Report and Recommendations re 17 , granting 10 Motion to Dismiss Case. Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 23, 2016. (mll)
March 16, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on The United States. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on March 16, 2016. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service)(mll)
January 6, 2016 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to submit fully completed IFP application on or before January 22, 2016. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 6, 2016. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quadri v. The United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taofeek A. Quadri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?