Nelson v. City of Hope Hempstead County Arkansas et al

Plaintiff: Alisa Nelson
Defendant: City of Hope Hempstead County Arkansas, Ramsey and Catherine Cook
Case Number: 4:2016cv04009
Filed: January 13, 2016
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Hempstead
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 14, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing case with prejudice pursuant to terms of settlement agreement. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 14, 2017. (mll)
April 19, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER. (Initial Settlement Conference set for 5/8/2017 10:00 AM in Texarkana -- 3rd flr (AR side) before Honorable Barry A. Bryant.) Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 19, 2017. (mll)
February 16, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 30 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 30 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on February 16, 2017. (mll)
December 6, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 19 Motion to Submit Evidence. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on December 6, 2016. (mll)
May 10, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Motion to Strike. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on May 10, 2016. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. City of Hope Hempstead County Arkansas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisa Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hope Hempstead County Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?