Sorrell Holdings LLC v. Infinity Headwear & Apparel, LLC
Plaintiff: Sorrell Holdings LLC
Defendant: Infinity Headwear & Apparel, LLC
Case Number: 4:2016cv04019
Filed: February 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Benton
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER denying 144 Motion to Dismiss Case and Setting Deadlines for Discovery and Dispositive Motions. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 17, 2021. (mll)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting 120 Motion in Limine; denying 122 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 125 Motion in Limine; granting 127 Motion in Limine. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 8, 2021. (mll)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER denying 84 Second Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 18, 2020. (mll)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER denying 60 Motion to Strike Defendant's Supplemental Amended Invalidity Contentions; granting 61 Motion to Supplement Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 21, 2020. (mll)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting in part 78 Motion to Lift Stay and for Entry of Proposed Scheduling Order. The stay of this case is lifted. The Court will separately issue a new Final Scheduling Order, setting a new trial date and new pretrial deadlines. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 7, 2020. (mll)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER POSTPONING MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Signed by Honorable Caroline M. Craven on November 25, 2019. (mll)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting 67 Motion to Stay. (See Order for specifics.) Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 3, 2019. (mll)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER denying 59 Motion for Reconsideration and providing the Court's interpretation of "figurative handle." Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 30, 2018. (mll)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER referring matter to Magistrate Judge Caroline M. Craven of the Eastern District of Texas for settlement conference. (See Order for specifics.) Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 20, 2018. (mll)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 12, 2018. (mll)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying 34 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 25, 2018. (mll)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER awarding attorney's fees and costs. (See Order for specifics.) Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 4, 2017. (mll)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 16, 2016. (mll)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sorrell Holdings LLC v. Infinity Headwear & Apparel, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sorrell Holdings LLC
Represented By: Robert D. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinity Headwear & Apparel, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?