Hill v. Johnson et al

Plaintiff: Alexius M. Hill
Defendant: Kirk Johnson, Medical Staff of the Bi-State Justice Building, Brittney Cooksy, Y. Morgan, Medical Staff of Bowie County Correctional Center and Matt Stevens
Case Number: 4:2016cv04033
Filed: April 15, 2016
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 MOTION to Dismiss Case. Plaintiff's claims as to all Defendants are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 13, 2017. (mll)
October 4, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 18 Motion to Compel. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 4, 2016. (mll)
August 26, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 15 ; denying 10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 26, 2016. (mll)
July 1, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in toto; Plaintiff's claims against Kirk Johnson, Matt Stevens and the medical staff of Bowie County Correctional Center and Bi-State Justice Building are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 1, 2016. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexius M. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Staff of the Bi-State Justice Building
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittney Cooksy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Y. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Staff of Bowie County Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?