Townsend v. AutoZone Stores, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Joseph Townsend
Defendant: AutoZone Stores, LLC, AutoZone Stores, Inc., AutoZone Development, LLC, AutoZone Texas, LLC, AutoZoners, LLC and Randy Magness
Case Number: 4:2016cv04036
Filed: April 20, 2016
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Lafayette
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2017 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 71 Motion to Withdraw Motion; denying as moot 63 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 12, 2017. (mll)
June 27, 2017 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 53 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 55 Motion to Stay, Motion for Sanctions, Motion to Compel. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 27, 2017. (See Order for specifics.)(mll)
February 22, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 41 Motion to Stay. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 22, 2017. (mll)
November 4, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 6 Motion to Dismiss. (See Order for specifics.) AutoZoners, LLC, AutoZone Development, LLC and AutoZone Texas, LLC terminated. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 4, 2016. (mll)
October 25, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Motion for Twelve Person Jury. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 25, 2016. (mll)
July 15, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending Plaintiff's time to respond to Motion to Dismiss to July 20, 2016; ORDER granting 22 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Defendants' reply due on or before July 25, 2016. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 15, 2016. (mll)
April 20, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion to Dismiss FLSA Claim. (Originally filed in state court.) (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Townsend v. AutoZone Stores, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Townsend
Represented By: Lucien Gillham
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AutoZone Stores, LLC
Represented By: William Stuart Jackson
Represented By: Seth R. Jewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AutoZone Stores, Inc.
Represented By: William Stuart Jackson
Represented By: Seth R. Jewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AutoZone Development, LLC
Represented By: William Stuart Jackson
Represented By: Seth R. Jewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AutoZone Texas, LLC
Represented By: William Stuart Jackson
Represented By: Seth R. Jewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AutoZoners, LLC
Represented By: William Stuart Jackson
Represented By: Seth R. Jewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Magness
Represented By: William Stuart Jackson
Represented By: Seth R. Jewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?