Solomon v. Southern Health Partners et al

Plaintiff: Clifton Orlando Solomon
Defendant: Southern Health Partners and Steven King
Case Number: 4:2016cv04038
Filed: April 22, 2016
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 1, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 34 Motion to Compel. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 1, 2016. (mll)
October 19, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 31 Motion to Supplement. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 19, 2016. (mll)
October 13, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 24 ; granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's claim regarding HIPAA violations is dismissed. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 13, 2016. (mll)
May 24, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 9 Motion for Order. Plaintiff is ordered not to file any additional motion until Complaint has been screened, service ordered and Defendants have answered. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on May 24, 2016. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solomon v. Southern Health Partners et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifton Orlando Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Health Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?