Burchfield v. Harrelson et al

Plaintiff: Bradley Craig Burchfield
Defendant: Jeff Harrelson, Monty Woods, Bryan Chesshir, Chris Walcott, Benny Simmons and Doe
Case Number: 4:2016cv04050
Filed: May 31, 2016
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 7, 2017 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 79 Motion to Strike 78 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; ORDER giving Plaintiff until June 21, 2017 to file a brief in Support of his Motion for Summary Judgment and Statement of Material Facts. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on June 7, 2017. (mll)
April 19, 2017 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 76 Motion for Transcript. The Clerk is directed to send all materials produced by City Tele-Coin Company to Plaintiff's current address. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 19, 2017. (mll)
January 20, 2017 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in part Report and Recommendations re 59 ; denying 43 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 47 Motion to Order for Preliminary Injunction and TRO. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 20, 2017. (mll)
October 26, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 31 ; denying 27 Motion to Order for a Preliminary Injunction and a Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 26, 2016. (mll)
October 25, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 18 ; Jeff Harrelson (Public Defender, Texarkana), Monty Woods (Assistant Prosecuting Attorney, DeQueen), Bryan Chesshir (Assistant Prosecuting Attorney, DeQueen) and Doe (Betty, Jeff Harrelson's Secretary) terminated. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 25, 2016. (mll)
September 15, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 36 Motion to Postpone Judgment; denying 38 Motion to Amend Response; denying 40 Motion to Amend Complaint; denying 46 Motion to Supplement Legal Allegation; denying 48 for Formal Complaint; denying 49 Motion to Supplement Evidence; denying 50 Motion to Supplement Legal Remedy; denying 54 Motion for Service; denying 55 Motion for Service. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 15, 2016. (mll)
June 30, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Motion to Supplement Complaint. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on June 30, 2016. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burchfield v. Harrelson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Craig Burchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Harrelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monty Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Chesshir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Walcott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benny Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?