White v. Kelly

Plaintiff: Kenneth White
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Case Number: 4:2016cv04067
Filed: July 7, 2016
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 12, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 30 ; denying 29 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 12, 2017. (mll)
February 15, 2017 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to 23 Report and Recommendations, MOTION for Reconsideration re 21 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. Objections to R&R due by 3/10/2017. Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration and request for a form to file are denied. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 15, 2017. (mll)
January 20, 2017 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 7 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting 10 Motion to Enter Exhibit as Evidence; denying 12 Motion to Order Defendant to Answer; granting 14 Motion to Enter Exhibit as Evidence; denying 15 Motion to Compel; granting 16 Motion to Enter Exhibit as Evidence; granting 17 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 19 Motion to Enter Exhibit as Evidence. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 20, 2017. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Represented By: Adam Donner Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?