Higgs v. PNK, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jared Higgs
Defendant: PNK, Inc. and Jerry Freeman
Case Number: 4:2016cv04079
Filed: August 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Nevada
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 JUDGMENT dismissing Plaintiff's Complaint with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on August 23, 2019. (mll)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 38 Motion to Withdraw Filing; denying as moot 34 Motion to Approve Settlement, Approve Attorney Fees, and Distribute Settlement Proceeds. (See Order for specifics.) Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 25, 2018. (mll)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re 31 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party/Case filed by Vinson Keith Hardage; Vinson Keith Hardage is dismissed with prejudice as to all claims and causes of action as Intervenor-Plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 10, 2018. (cnn)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting Motion to Terminate Deadlines 29 filed by Jared Higgs. (See Order for specifics.) Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 26, 2017. (mll)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 16 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 13, 2017. (mll)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Higgs v. PNK, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Higgs
Represented By: Matthew F. Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNK, Inc.
Represented By: Roy Stacy
Represented By: Scott Michael Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Freeman
Represented By: Roy Stacy
Represented By: Scott Michael Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?