Johnston v. Progressive Environmental Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Corey Johnston
Defendant: Progressive Environmental Services, Inc. and Jared Stanley
Case Number: 4:2016cv04111
Filed: November 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 AMENDED ORDER re 29 MOTION for Order to Allow Limited Discovery. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 21, 2017. (See Order for specific deadlines.) (mll)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 27 Motion to Allow Limited Supplementation of Expert Disclosures. (See Order for specifics.) Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 20, 2017. (mll)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 1, 2017. (mll)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 14 Motion to Withdraw; denying as moot 8 Motion to Strike, 9 MOTION to Strike. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 31, 2017. (mll)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnston v. Progressive Environmental Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Johnston
Represented By: Will Bond
Represented By: Neil Chamberlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Environmental Services, Inc.
Represented By: Baxter D. Drennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Stanley
Represented By: Baxter D. Drennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?