Lewis v. Kennemore et al
Plaintiff: Jermain D. Lewis
Defendant: Brandon Kennemore, Ashdown Police Department, Little River Sheriff's Department, Julie Smith and Mickey Buchanan
Case Number: 4:2017cv04051
Filed: July 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER dismissing Plaintiff's Complaint without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 1, 2018. (mll)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER denying 52 Motion to Dismiss filed by Joseph Goings as set forth. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 26, 2018. (mfr)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 27 Motion to Dismiss separate defendants Kimberly Geiser Strube (Ashdown Police Officer ), Carl Farmer (Ashdown Police Officer ) and Brandon Kennemore (Ashdown Police Department) in theirindividual and official capacities are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 14, 2018. (cnn)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER denying as moot 46 Motion to Supplement; granting 54 Motion to Supplement; Deputy Tatum added. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 8, 2018. (mll) Modified docket text on 1/8/2018. (mll)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying 39 Motion for Default Judgment; ORDER DIRECTING that Plaintiff provide the Court with a proper address for service on Defendant Julie Smith by 12/5/2017. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 21, 2017. (mll)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER terminating John Doe Defendants. John Does 1-4 (Little River Sheriff's Department) and John Does 1-5 (Ashdown Police Department) terminated. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 7, 2017. (mll)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER terminating Bobby Walraven as a Defendant. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 31, 2017. (mll)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER dismissing Defendants Little River Sheriff's Department, Ashdown Police Department and Mickey Buchanan (Attorney) with prejudice. Plaintiff's claims against all other Defendants shall proceed. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 31, 2017. (mll)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER giving Plaintiff until August 22, 2017 to file a Supplement to his Complaint. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on August 1, 2017. (mll) (Document mailed to non-ECF Participant Jermain D. Lewis.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Kennemore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jermain D. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Kennemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashdown Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little River Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mickey Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?