Winkle v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Scott Van Winkle
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 4:2018cv04122
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405g
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Van Winkle. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 9/4/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (Giles, Greg)
August 30, 2018 Filing 8 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mll)
August 30, 2018 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to U.S.Attorney, Attorney General, Office of Gen. Counsel for service of the following document: #1 Complaint. (Giles, Greg)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #2 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Social Security Administration Commissioner. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on August 30, 2018. (mll)
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Scott Van Winkle. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (Giles, Greg)
August 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 9/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Mag Consent) (mll)
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Scott Van Winkle. (mll)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by Scott Van Winkle. (mll)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner filed by Scott Van Winkle. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winkle v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Van Winkle
Represented By: Greg R. Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?