Devine v. Walker et al
Plaintiff: Robert Devine
Defendant: Sergeant Allen Sanders, Miller County Jail, Officer Hennesey, Lieutenant Barnes, Officer Cornell, Nurse King, Warden Jeffie Walker, John Doe Officers 1-3 Miller County Jail and Sheriff Runion
Case Number: 4:2018cv04156
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment Motion due by 6/7/2019 (sss)
January 8, 2019 Filing 16 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Please see attached document for complete deadline information. Identity of John/Jane Doe Defendants due by 4/8/2019. Summary Judgment Motion due by 6/07/2019. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 8, 2019. (sss) Modified on 1/8/2019 (sss).
January 7, 2019 Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ORDER Directed to Plaintiff to Provide Information to Serve Defendant(s). It is the responsibility of the Plaintiff to provide the Court with an address for proper service on the Defendants. See Lee v. Armontrout, 991 F.2d 487, 489 (8th Cir. 1993). Summons to Defendant Officr Cornell, Officer Hennessey, and Lieutenant Barnes has been returned unexecuted. Plaintiff is therefore ordered to provide the Court with an additional address or identifying information to use in serving Defendant Officr Cornell, Officer Hennessey, and Lieutenant Barnes no later than 21 days from the entry of this order. If the Plaintiff fails to provide the additional information by the deadline, Defendant Officr Cornell, Officer Hennessey, and Lieutenant Barnes will be dismissed as a party from this case. Information for Service due by 1/28/2019. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 7, 2019. (klk)
January 3, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Address for Robert Devine. There are no documents to resend. (mll)
January 2, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Sheriff Runion, Allen Sanders, Jeffie Walker.(Davis, JaNan)
December 27, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Devine. Nurse King served on 12/21/2018, answer due 1/11/2019. (mll)
December 27, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Devine. Sheriff Runion served on 12/19/2018, answer due 1/9/2019; Allen Sanders served on 12/19/2018, answer due 1/9/2019; Jeffie Walker served on 12/19/2018, answer due 1/9/2019. (mll)
December 24, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint, by Nurse King.(Cook, James)
December 13, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Robert Devine as to Lieutenant Barnes, Officer Cornell, Officer Hennesey. (mll)
December 7, 2018 Filing 8 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Lieutenant Barnes, Officer Cornell, Officer Hennesey, Nurse King, Sheriff Runion, Allen Sanders, Jeffie Walker and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #7 Order Directing Service, #6 Amended Complaint. (cnn)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Lieutenant Barnes, Officer Cornell, Officer Hennesey, Nurse King, Sheriff Runion, Allen Sanders, Jeffie Walker and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on December 7, 2018. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified).(cnn)
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Lieutenant Barnes, Allen Sanders, John Doe Officers 1-3 Miller County Jail, Jeffie Walker, Nurse King, Officer Cornell, Officer Hennesey, Sheriff Runion filed by Robert Devine.(mll) Modified docket text on 12/4/2018 (mfr).
November 16, 2018 Filing 5 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Fee directing TDCJ - Jester 3 Unit to collect from petitioner's prison account monthly payments in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. (mll)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mll)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the Miller County Jail as a defendant. The Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $350.00; ORDER DIRECTING that an Amended Complaint be filed by 12/6/2018. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 15, 2018. (mll) Modified docket text on 12/4/2018 (mfr).
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Robert Devine. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant. (mll)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Lieutenant Barnes, Officer Cornell, Officer Hennesey, Nurse King, John Doe Officers 1-3 Miller County Jail, Allen Sanders, Jeffie Walker filed by Robert Devine. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Devine v. Walker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Allen Sanders
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Hennesey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Cornell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse King
Represented By: James Levi Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Jeffie Walker
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Officers 1-3 Miller County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Runion
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Devine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?