Langston v. Poole et al

Plaintiff: Darrell Langston
Defendant: Officer Poole and Officer Bo Johnson
Case Number: 4:2019cv04041
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Officer Bo Johnson, Officer Poole.(Jones, Jamie)
May 20, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) with Jury Demand by Officer Bo Johnson, Officer Poole.(Jones, Jamie)
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Huffman Jones on behalf of Officer Bo Johnson, Officer Poole. (Jones, Jamie)
May 17, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darrell Langston. Officer Bo Johnson served on 5/9/2019, answer due 5/30/2019; Officer Poole served on 5/9/2019, answer due 5/30/2019. (mll)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address for Darrell Langston. There are no documents to resend. (mll)
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Officer Bo Johnson, Officer Poole and USM285 Form Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #6 Amended Complaint, #7 Order Directing Service. (mll)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Officer Bo Johnson, Officer Poole and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 29, 2019. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service). (mll)
April 26, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Officer Bo Johnson, Officer Poole filed by Darrell Langston. (mll)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Fee directing Miller County Correctional Facility to collect from petitioner's prison account monthly payments in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. (mll)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mll)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING that a Completed Complaint be filed by 5/3/2019; ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. The Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $350.00. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 15, 2019. (mll)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Darrell Langston. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant. (mll)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Officer Bo Johnson, Officer Poole filed by Darrell Langston. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langston v. Poole et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Poole
Represented By: Jamie Huffman Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Bo Johnson
Represented By: Jamie Huffman Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Langston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?