Francisco v. Cooper Tire & Rubber Company
Plaintiff: Phalanza S. Francisco
Defendant: Cooper Tire & Rubber Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv04058
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Defendant's Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings) by Cooper Tire & Rubber Company. (Webster, Clarence)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Defendant's Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings) by Cooper Tire & Rubber Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Charge of Discrimination))Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(Webster, Clarence)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cooper Tire & Rubber Company. (Webster, Clarence)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Cooper Tire & Rubber Company.(Webster, Clarence)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER REFERRING CASE to Honorable Barry A. Bryant pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and Local Rule 72.1 for full pretrial/dispositive motions. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 4, 2019. (rwg) Modified on 6/4/2019 to reflect TEXT ONLY ORDER. (rwg).
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Cooper Tire & Rubber Company and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #5 Order on Motion for Service,, Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #1 Complaint. (src)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and DIRECTING SERVICE on Cooper Tire & Rubber Company. Defendant is to answer within 21 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on June 3, 2019. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service)(src)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service. Motions referred to Honorable Barry A. Bryant. (mll)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mll)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Phalanza S. Francisco. (mll). Added MOTION for Service on 5/30/2019. (mll) (Main Document replaced on 5/30/2019 with document bearing correct date filed.) (mll).
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cooper Tire & Rubber Company filed by Phalanza S. Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A)(mll) (Main Document replaced on 5/30/2019 with document bearing correct date filed.) (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Francisco v. Cooper Tire & Rubber Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phalanza S. Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Clarence Webster, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?