Ledbetter et al v. Oller et al
Plaintiff: Jordan Ledbetter and Aaron Smith, Jr.
Defendant: Daniel "Frog&quot Oller and City of Hope
Case Number: 4:2019cv04075
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #9 Motion to Stay; denying as moot #13 Motion for Leave; ORDER OF DISMISSAL dismissing Complaint without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 7, 2019. (mll)
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Criminal Disposition by City of Hope, Daniel "Frog" Oller. (Gibson, Gabrielle)
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 BRIEF in support of #11 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #9 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Criminal Disposition Brief filed by Jordan Ledbetter, Aaron Smith, Jr.. (Walker, Lawrence) Modified on 8/1/2019 to correct text and add document link (cnn).
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #9 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Criminal Disposition Response filed by Jordan Ledbetter, Aaron Smith, Jr.. (Walker, Lawrence)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #9 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Criminal Disposition by City of Hope, Daniel "Frog" Oller. (Gibson, Gabrielle)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Criminal Disposition by City of Hope, Daniel "Frog" Oller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gibson, Gabrielle)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by City of Hope, Daniel "Frog" Oller.(Gibson, Gabrielle)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Gabrielle Denise Gibson on behalf of City of Hope, Daniel "Frog" Oller. (Gibson, Gabrielle)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Afdavit of Service, filed by All Plaintiffs. Daniel "Frog" Oller served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (Walker, Lawrence)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for affidavit of Service, filed by All Plaintiffs. City of Hope served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (Walker, Lawrence)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to City of Hope, Daniel "Frog" Oller and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mll)
June 26, 2019 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading Complaint #1 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney, who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: John. W. Walker. (mll)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mll)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Jordan Ledbetter, Aaron Smith, Jr. (mll) Modified file date on 6/26/2019. (mll)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Hope, Daniel "Frog" Oller (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number 4001284) filed by Jordan Ledbetter, Aaron Smith, Jr. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ledbetter et al v. Oller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel "Frog&quot Oller
Represented By: Gabrielle Denise Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hope
Represented By: Gabrielle Denise Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Ledbetter
Represented By: Lawrence Anthony Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence Anthony Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?