Boyd v. Culpepper et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Waylon Boyd
Defendant: Tim McBrayer, Matthew Ford, Officer Brown, Prosecutor Traci Graham, Justin Hurst, Phillip Harris, James Singleton, Joe T Tyler, Danny Rogers, Billy Moritz, Sean Clark, Judge Randal Wright, Evans, Kolby Harper, Deputy Simmons, Judge Duncan Culpepper, Bo Morris and Sgt. Hughes
Case Number: 4:2019cv04077
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER striking #12 Second Amended Complaint; ORDER DIRECTING that a Second Amended Complaint be filed by 9/20/2019. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on August 28, 2019. (mll)
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 ***STRICKEN PER #13 ORDER*** SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Matthew Ford, Justin Hurst, Simmons, Duncan Culpepper, Traci Graham, Bo Morris, Evans, Sean Clark, Phillip Harris, Randal Wright, Joe T Tyler, Brown, Hughes, James Singleton, Danny Rogers, Kolby Harper, Billy Moritz, Tim McBrayer filed by Thomas Waylon Boyd. (mll) Modified on 8/28/2019. (mll)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING that a Second Amended Complaint be filed. Amended Complaint due by 8/19/2019. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on July 29, 2019. (mll)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Thomas Waylon Boyd. (mll)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING that an Amended Complaint be filed by 8/2/2019. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on July 10, 2019. (mll)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Fee directing Bowie County Correctional Center to collect from petitioner's prison account monthly payments in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. (mll)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as after review it is found that Plaintiff is unable to pay for the costs of commencement of this suit. Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address.Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. The clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $350.00.Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on July 10, 2019. (mlf)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mll)
July 9, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Honorable Barry A. Bryant: #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Thomas Waylon Boyd. Motions referred to Honorable Barry A. Bryant. (mll)
July 9, 2019 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) transferred in from Eastern District of Arkansas. (mll)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00462. Docket sheet received.
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to immediately transfer Plaintiff's entire case file to the United States District Court for the Western District of Arkansas. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/9/2019. (ljb) [Transferred from ared on 7/9/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF REFERRAL referring the above-styled case to Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray for further proceedings and recommendation. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/2/2019. (jbh) [Transferred from ared on 7/9/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Thomas Waylon Boyd. (ljb) [Transferred from ared on 7/9/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Thomas Waylon Boyd. (ljb) [Transferred from ared on 7/9/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyd v. Culpepper et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim McBrayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prosecutor Traci Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe T Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Moritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Randal Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kolby Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Duncan Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bo Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Waylon Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?