Horton v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Gregory H. Horton and Gregory C. Horton
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 4:2019cv04078
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:0405g
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory C. Horton. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 7/22/2017, answer due 9/20/2017. (Giles, Greg)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mll)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to U. S. Attorney, Attorney General, Office of Regional Chief Counsel for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Giles, Greg)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #3 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Social Security Administration Commissioner. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on July 16, 2019. (mll)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Gregory H. Horton. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (Giles, Greg)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 7/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Mag Consent). (mll)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , MOTION for Service by Gregory H. Horton. (Giles, Greg)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Gregory H. Horton.(Giles, Greg)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Gregory H. Horton. Please proceed with filing your case initiating documents. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horton v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory H. Horton
Represented By: Greg R. Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory C. Horton
Represented By: Greg R. Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Represented By: Office of Regional Counsel-Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?