Jewell v. WalMart, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Jewell
Defendant: WalMart, Inc. and Does 1 - 100
Case Number: 4:2019cv04088
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Dawn Avila on behalf of Anthony Jewell. (Avila, Sara)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Gillian Leigh Wade on behalf of Anthony Jewell. (Wade, Gillian)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Sara D. Avila is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 26, 2019. (res)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Gillian L. Wade is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 26, 2019. (res)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Attorney Sara D. Avila to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1969474) by Anthony Jewell. (Avila, Sara)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney Gillian L. Wade to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1969464) by Anthony Jewell. (Wade, Gillian)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mll)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-1960925), filed by Anthony Jewell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Harrelson, Steven)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Anthony Jewell. Please proceed with filing your case initiating documents. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jewell v. WalMart, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WalMart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Jewell
Represented By: Steven P Harrelson
Represented By: Sara Dawn Avila
Represented By: Gillian Leigh Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?