Richardson v. Tri-State Iron and Metal Co.
Plaintiff: 134785 Reginald D. Richardson and Reginald D. Richardson
Defendant: Tri-State Iron and Metal Co.
Case Number: 4:2019cv04095
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 13 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be held by 11/14/2019. JOINT Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 11/21/2019. Jury Trial set for the week of 10/19/2020 in Texarkana -- 3rd flr (AR side) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 16, 2019. (rwg)
October 16, 2019 Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ORDER REFERRING CASE to Honorable Barry A. Bryant - Full Pretrial/Dispositive Motions. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 16, 2019. (rwg)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying as moot #8 MOTION to Correct #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 25, 2019. (mll)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Tri-State Iron and Metal Co..(Trammell, Michael)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Reginald D. Richardson. Tri-State Iron and Metal Co. served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (mll)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Correct #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983), Order on Motion for Service, by Reginald D. Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Clerk)(lw)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Tri-State Iron and Metal Co. and USM285 Forms Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #1 Complaint, #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #6 Order on Motion for Service. (mll)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983); granting #4 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Tri-State Iron and Metal Co. Defendant is to answer within 21 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on August 20, 2019. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service)(mll)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTIONS REFERRED to Honorable Barry A. Bryant: #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) filed by Reginald D. Richardson. Motions referred to Honorable Barry A. Bryant.(hnc)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983); MOTION for Service by Reginald D. Richardson. (hnc)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (hnc)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Reginald D. Richardson. (hnc) Modified on 8/20/2019 to edit filing date (hnc).
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Tri-State Iron and Metal Co., filed by Reginald D. Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Dismissal and Notice of Rights, #2 Attachment: envelope)(hnc) Modified on 8/20/2019 to edit filing date (hnc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Tri-State Iron and Metal Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 134785 Reginald D. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald D. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri-State Iron and Metal Co.
Represented By: Michael Chad Trammell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?