MidAmerica, Inc. v. Bierlein Companies, Inc.
Plaintiff: MidAmerica, Inc.
Defendant: Bierlein Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv04096
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 14 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be held by 11/14/2019. JOINT Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 11/21/2019. Jury Trial set for the week of 10/26/2020 in Texarkana -- 3rd flr (AR side) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 16, 2019. (rwg)
October 2, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathane E. Lauderbach on behalf of Bierlein Companies, Inc.. (Lauderbach, Jonathane)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Jonathan E. Lauderbach is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 30, 2019. (fcs)
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney Jonathan E. Lauderbach to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1989521) by Bierlein Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Latchford, Shawn)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bierlein Companies, Inc.. (Latchford, Shawn)
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Bierlein Companies, Inc..(Latchford, Shawn)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, filed by MidAmerica, Inc.. Bierlein Companies, Inc. served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Sellers, Nathan)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Scott on behalf of MidAmerica, Inc.. (Scott, John)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MidAmerica, Inc.. (Sellers, Nathan)
August 21, 2019 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Plaintiff MidAmerica, Inc. Complaint #2 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney, who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: John M. Scott. (mll)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Bierlein Companies, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mll)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mll)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Bierlein Companies, Inc. for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Sellers, Nathan)
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Bierlein Companies, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-1966936), filed by MidAmerica, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subcontract)(Sellers, Nathan)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by MidAmerica, Inc. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document.If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MidAmerica, Inc. v. Bierlein Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MidAmerica, Inc.
Represented By: Nathan R. Sellers
Represented By: John M. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bierlein Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan E. Lauderbach
Represented By: Shawn Latchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?