Boyette et al v. Lowes Companies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Amanda Boyette and James Weeks
Defendant: Lowes Companies, Inc. and Does 1 through 100
Case Number: 4:2019cv04119
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Dawn Avila on behalf of Amanda Boyette, James Weeks. (Avila, Sara)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Gillian Leigh Wade on behalf of Amanda Boyette, James Weeks. (Wade, Gillian)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Sara D. Avila is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 18, 2019. (res)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Gillian L. Wade is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 18, 2019. (res)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney Sara D. Avila to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1999937) by Amanda Boyette, James Weeks. (Avila, Sara)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Attorney Gillian L. Wade to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1999935) by Amanda Boyette, James Weeks. (Wade, Gillian)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mll)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Declaration of Venue filed by James Weeks . (Harrelson, Steven)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-1982423), filed by Amanda Boyette, James Weeks.(Harrelson, Steven)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Amanda Boyette, James Weeks. Please proceed with filing your case initiating documents.If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyette et al v. Lowes Companies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Boyette
Represented By: Steven P Harrelson
Represented By: Sara Dawn Avila
Represented By: Gillian Leigh Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Weeks
Represented By: Steven P Harrelson
Represented By: Sara Dawn Avila
Represented By: Gillian Leigh Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowes Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?