Arvest Bank v. Harris et al
Plaintiff: Arvest Bank
Defendant: Delia McDaniel Harris, Ann McDaniel Harris and Kimble Harris
Case Number: 4:2019cv04144
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Dismiss Case. Parties have settled. Case is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to terms of settlement agreement. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 17, 2020. (mll)
January 17, 2020 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Case WITH PREJUDICE by Delia McDaniel Harris, Kimble Harris. (Dalby, Robert)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants have up to and including January 20, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 2, 2020. (mll)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Delia McDaniel Harris, Kimble Harris. (Dalby, Robert)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants have up to and including January 6, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 26, 2019. (mll)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Delia McDaniel Harris, Kimble Harris. (Dalby, Robert)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Haltom Doan on behalf of All Defendants. (Doan, Jennifer)
November 22, 2019 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #3 Complaint, #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-2021779.. (Dalby, Robert)
November 22, 2019 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Defendants Delia McDaniel Harris, Kimble Harris. Notice of Removal #1 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney, who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Jennifer H. Doan. (mll)
November 21, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 11/25/2019. (mll)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mll)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Delia McDaniel Harris, Kimble Harris filed by Arvest Bank. (Originally filed in state court.) (mll)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Delia McDaniel Harris, Kimble Harris. (mll)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sevier County Circuit Court, case number 67CV-19-83. filed by Kimble Harris, Delia McDaniel Harris. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - G - State Court Documents) (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arvest Bank v. Harris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delia McDaniel Harris
Represented By: Robert C Dalby
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann McDaniel Harris
Represented By: Robert C Dalby
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimble Harris
Represented By: Robert C Dalby
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arvest Bank
Represented By: J. Gregory Magness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?