Hutcheson v. Nevada County Jail
Plaintiff: Christopher E Hutcheson
Defendant: Nevada County Jail
Case Number: 4:2019cv04150
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mll)
November 26, 2019 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) transferred in from Eastern District of Arkansas. (mll)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00830. Docket sheet received.
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Clerk to transfer this case immediately to the USDC for the Western District of Arkansas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/25/2019. (lej) [Transferred from ared on 11/26/2019.]
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Nevada County Jail, filed by Christopher E Hutcheson.(kdr) [Transferred from ared on 11/26/2019.]
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher E Hutcheson. (kdr) [Transferred from ared on 11/26/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutcheson v. Nevada County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher E Hutcheson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?