Foreman Electric Services, Inc. v. Haliron Power, Inc.
Plaintiff: Foreman Electric Services, Inc.
Defendant: Haliron Power, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv04157
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Filing 36 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Haliron Power, Inc.. (Langdon, Brent)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dick R. Holland withdrawn. The Clerk of Court is directed to remove his name from the list of attorneys receiving Notices of Electronic Filing in this case. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 7, 2020. (mll)
February 7, 2020 Filing 34 First MOTION of Dick R. Holland to Withdraw as Attorney for Haliron Power, LLC by Haliron Power, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Langdon, Brent)
February 6, 2020 Filing 33 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be conducted on or before 3/5/2020. JOINT Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 3/12/2020. Bench Trial set for 2/22/2021 in Texarkana -- 3rd flr (AR side) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 6, 2020. (rwg)
January 10, 2020 Filing 32 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Kristen Vander-Plas is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 10, 2020. (res)
January 10, 2020 Filing 31 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Brad J. Davidson is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 10, 2020. (res)
January 10, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for Attorney Kristen Vander-Plas to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2054722) by Foreman Electric Services, Inc.. (Glass, C.)
January 10, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Attorney Brad J. Davidson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2054718) by Foreman Electric Services, Inc.. (Glass, C.)
January 10, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by C. David Glass on behalf of Foreman Electric Services, Inc.. (Glass, C.)
December 23, 2019 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE: The following attorneys listed on Notice of Removal #1 , Complaint #27 are not registered for CM/ECF noticing and filing in the Western District of Arkansas:Brad J. Davidson, Kristen Reid Vander-Plas, Brent Langdon. An attorney can register through PACER for a CM/ECF login and password if they are admitted to practice in the U.S. District Courts for the Eastern and Western Districts of Arkansas or are admitted pro hac vice for this case. Any non-registered attorney should submit the proper attorney admission petition or file an appropriate motion. Please refer to our website http://www.arwd.uscourts.gov/attorney-information for further information. (mll)
December 23, 2019 Filing 27 COMPLAINT against Haliron Power, Inc. filed by Foreman Electric Services, Inc. (Originally filed in state court.)(mll)
December 17, 2019 Filing 26 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mll)
December 17, 2019 Filing 25 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 7:19-cv-00080. Docket sheet received.
December 16, 2019 Case transferred to District of Arkansas - Texarkana Division (ja) [Transferred from txwd on 12/17/2019.]
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE: The Court ORDERS that the above-captioned case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Arkansas, Texarkana Division. Signed by Judge David Counts. (ja) [Transferred from txwd on 12/17/2019.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 23 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case by Foreman Electric Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Joint Motion to Transfer Venue)(Davidson, Brad) [Transferred from txwd on 12/17/2019.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 22 CORRECTED MOTION for Hearing re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Alternatively, Motion to Transfer, #13 Response in Opposition to Motion, #17 Reply to Response to Motion, #16 Response to Motion, #21 Deficiency Notice, by Haliron Power, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Oral Hearing)(Langdon, Brent) [Transferred from txwd on 12/17/2019.]
October 10, 2019 Filing 21 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #20 MOTION for Hearing re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Alternatively, Motion to Transfer, #13 Response in Opposition to Motion, #17 Reply to Response to Motion, #16 Response to Motion (ja) [Transferred from txwd on 12/17/2019.]
October 10, 2019 Filing 20 ***Please see deficiency notice***MOTION for Hearing re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Alternatively, Motion to Transfer, #13 Response in Opposition to Motion, #17 Reply to Response to Motion, #16 Response to Motion by Haliron Power, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Langdon, Brent) Modified to add deficiency notice on 10/10/2019 (ja). Modified on 10/10/2019 (ja). [Transferred from txwd on 12/17/2019.]
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Selection set for 10/5/2020 08:00AM before Judge David Counts, Jury Trial set for 10/5/2020 08:00 AM before Judge David Counts, Status Conference set for 9/4/2020 01:30 PM before Judge David Counts, ADR Report Deadline due by 12/20/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 1/24/2020, Discovery due by 4/7/2020, Motions due by 5/15/2020,. Signed by Judge David Counts. (mm1) [Transferred from txwd on 12/17/2019.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 18 Scheduling Recommendations Agreed Scheduling Order Recommendations by Haliron Power, Inc.. (Langdon, Brent) [Transferred from txwd on 12/17/2019.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Haliron Power, Inc., re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Alternatively, Motion to Transfer filed by Defendant Haliron Power, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit LinkedIn Help Info, #2 Affidavit Weems Affidavit)(Langdon, Brent) [Transferred from txwd on 12/17/2019.]
September 10, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Foreman Electric Services, Inc., re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Alternatively, Motion to Transfer filed by Defendant Haliron Power, Inc. (Davidson, Brad) [Transferred from txwd on 12/17/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 15 ATTACHMENT to #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Alternatively, Motion to Transfer Proposed Order on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Haliron Power, Inc.. (Langdon, Brent) Modified event type and text on 9/5/2019 (se). [Transferred from txwd on 12/17/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 14 ATTACHMENT to #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Alternatively, Motion to Transfer Proposed Order on Defendant's Motion to Transfer by Haliron Power, Inc.. (Langdon, Brent) Modified event type and text on 9/5/2019 (se).[Transferred from txwd on 12/17/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 13 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Foreman Electric Services, Inc., re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Alternatively, Motion to Transfer filed by Defendant Haliron Power, Inc. (Davidson, Brad) [Transferred from txwd on 12/17/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint Subject to Motion to Dismiss and Alternatively, Motion to Transfer by Haliron Power, Inc..(Langdon, Brent) [Transferred from txwd on 12/17/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Alternatively, Motion to Transfer by Haliron Power, Inc.. (Langdon, Brent) [Transferred from txwd on 12/17/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge David Counts. (se) [Transferred from txwd on 12/17/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO AMEND PLEADINGS, IT IS ORDERED the Defendant, HALIRON POWER, INC., file an amended answer in compliance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure within ten (10) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge David Counts. (se) [Transferred from txwd on 12/17/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order It is ORDERED Kristen Reid Vander-Plas's Motion for Appearance Pro Hac Vice, Doc. #8 filed April 5, 2019, is GRANTED. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our Court within 10 days of this Order. It is further ORDERED that if Ms. Vander-Plas has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2). Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db) [Transferred from txwd on 12/17/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kristen Reid Vander-Plas (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 70014772) by Foreman Electric Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(se) [Transferred from txwd on 12/17/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order It is ORDERED Melissa G. McPherson's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, Doc. #7 filed March 28, 2019, is GRANTED. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our Court within 10 days of this Order. It is further ORDERED that if Ms. McPherson has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2). Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db) [Transferred from txwd on 12/17/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order It is ORDERED Brent M. Langdon's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, Doc. #6 filed March 28, 2019, is GRANTED. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our Court within 10 days of this Order. It is further ORDERED that if Mr. Langdon has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2). Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db) [Transferred from txwd on 12/17/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa G. McPherson (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 700014709) by Haliron Power, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(se) [Transferred from txwd on 12/17/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brent M. Langdon (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 700014708) by Haliron Power, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(se) [Transferred from txwd on 12/17/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 5 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Plaintiff's Attorney, Kristen Vander-Plas. (lw) (Main Document 5 replaced on 3/27/2019) (lw). [Transferred from txwd on 12/17/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 4 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Defendant's Attorney, Melissa G. McPherson. (lw) [Transferred from txwd on 12/17/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 3 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Defendant's Attorney, Brent M. Langdon. (lw) [Transferred from txwd on 12/17/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT Civil Cover Sheer by Haliron Power, Inc.. (Holland, Dick) [Transferred from txwd on 12/17/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lw) [Transferred from txwd on 12/17/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Haliron Power, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11917004), filed by Haliron Power, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet JS-44)(Holland, Dick) [Transferred from txwd on 12/17/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foreman Electric Services, Inc. v. Haliron Power, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foreman Electric Services, Inc.
Represented By: Brad J. Davidson
Represented By: Kristen Reid Vander-Plas
Represented By: C. David Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haliron Power, Inc.
Represented By: Dick R. Holland
Represented By: Brent M. Langdon
Represented By: Melissa G. McPherson
Represented By: Brent Maurice Langdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?