Nelson et al v. Santander Consumer USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Alisa Nelson and Stacy Jackson
Defendant: Santander Consumer USA, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv04018
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Santander Consumer USA, Inc., #8 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant filed by Alisa Nelson, #12 MOTION for Order of Protection and to Stop GPS Tracking/Starter Interruptions filed by Alisa Nelson. Objections to R&R due by 5/11/2020. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 22, 2020. (mll)
April 16, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Alisa Nelson. (mll)
April 16, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by Santander Consumer USA, Inc. re #13 Response to Motion [Certificate of Service] (Maher, Luke)
April 16, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #12 MOTION for Order of Protection and to Stop GPS Tracking/Starter Interruptions filed by Santander Consumer USA, Inc.. (Maher, Luke)
April 13, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Order of Protection and to Stop GPS Tracking/Starter Interruptions by Alisa Nelson. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(mll)
April 8, 2020 Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be conducted on or before 5/6/2020. JOINT Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 5/13/2020. Bench Trial set for the week of 3/22/2021 in Texarkana -- 3rd flr (AR side) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 8, 2020. (rwg)
April 6, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Santander Consumer USA, Inc.. (Maher, Luke)
April 6, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Santander Consumer USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Amanda Van Haren)Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(Maher, Luke)
March 30, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant by Alisa Nelson. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(mll)
March 25, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alisa Nelson, Stacy Jackson. Santander Consumer USA, Inc. served on 3/10/2020, answer due 3/31/2020. (mll)
March 3, 2020 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Santander Consumer USA, Inc. and USM285 Form delivered to USMS for defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #1 Complaint, #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #5 Order Directing Service. (mll)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Santander Consumer USA, Inc. and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on March 3, 2020. (mll)
March 3, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ORDER REFERRING CASE to Honorable Barry A. Bryant for full pretrial/dispositive motions pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and Local Rule 72.1. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 3, 2020. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(rwg)
February 25, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED to Honorable Barry A. Bryant: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Alisa Nelson. Motions referred to Honorable Barry A. Bryant.(mll)
February 25, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mll)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Alisa Nelson. (mll)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Santander Consumer USA, Inc. filed by Alisa Nelson, Stacy Jackson.(mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson et al v. Santander Consumer USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisa Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santander Consumer USA, Inc.
Represented By: Luke Maher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?