White v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Helen White
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 4:2020cv04087
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Helen White. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 10/5/2020, answer due 12/4/2020. (Giles, Greg)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mll)
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to U. S. Attorney, Attorney General, Office of Regional Chief Counsel for service of the following document: #3 Complaint. (Giles, Greg)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #4 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Social Security Administration Commissioner. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 29, 2020. (mll)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Helen White. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (Giles, Greg)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , MOTION for Service by Helen White. (Giles, Greg)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Helen White.(Giles, Greg)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 10/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form)(cnn)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Helen White. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen White
Represented By: Greg R. Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?