Eagle Distributing of Texarkana, Inc. v. Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Eagle Distributing of Texarkana, Inc.
Defendant: Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Pepsico, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv04097
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Pepsico, Inc.'s answer due 1/11/2021. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 21, 2020. (mll)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc's Answer due 1/5/2021. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 21, 2020. (mll)
December 18, 2020 Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Oesch, Nathan)
December 18, 2020 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by Pepsico, Inc.. (Keller, Thomas)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer due 12/21/2020.. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 8, 2020. (cnn)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Pepsico, Inc. answer due 12/21/2020. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 8, 2020. (cnn)
December 7, 2020 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Oesch, Nathan)
December 7, 2020 Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by Pepsico, Inc.. (Keller, Thomas)
December 4, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Wade on behalf of Pepsico, Inc.. (Wade, Joshua)
December 2, 2020 Filing 30 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Joshua Wade is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 2, 2020. (hla)
December 2, 2020 Filing 29 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Geoffrey Sigler is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 2, 2020. (hla)
December 1, 2020 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eagle Distributing of Texarkana, Inc.. (Spivey, Patrick)
December 1, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Attorney Joshua Wade to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2282146) by Pepsico, Inc.. (Keller, Thomas)
December 1, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Attorney Geoffrey Sigler to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2282137) by Pepsico, Inc.. (Keller, Thomas)
December 1, 2020 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pepsico, Inc.. (Keller, Thomas)
December 1, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Christoph Keller on behalf of Pepsico, Inc.. (Keller, Thomas)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer due 12/7/2020. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 30, 2020. (mll)
November 25, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary T Eastburn on behalf of Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Eastburn, Zachary)
November 25, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Oesch on behalf of Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Oesch, Nathan)
November 25, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Janssen on behalf of Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Janssen, Daniel)
November 23, 2020 Filing 19 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Zachary T. Eastburn is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 23, 2020. (hla)
November 23, 2020 Filing 18 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Nathan J. Oesch is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 23, 2020. (hla)
November 23, 2020 Filing 17 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Daniel M. Janssen is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 23, 2020. (hla)
November 20, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (King, Andrew)
November 20, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney Zachary T. Eastburn to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2277767) by Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (King, Andrew)
November 20, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney Nathan J. Oesch to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2277765) by Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (King, Andrew)
November 20, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney Daniel M. Janssen to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2277764) by Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (King, Andrew)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Pepsico, Inc. answer due 12/7/2020. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 18, 2020. (mll)
November 18, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint Defendant Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (King, Andrew)
November 18, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew King on behalf of Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (King, Andrew)
November 11, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by Pepsico, Inc.. (Chiles, E.)
November 11, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, filed by Eagle Distributing of Texarkana, Inc.. Pepsico, Inc. served on 11/2/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Spivey, Patrick)
November 6, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Eagle Distributing of Texarkana, Inc.. Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 11/2/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Spivey, Patrick)
October 29, 2020 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Pepsico, Inc., Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mll)
October 29, 2020 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Pepsico, Inc. for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Spivey, Patrick)
October 29, 2020 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Spivey, Patrick)
October 29, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mll)
October 28, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Pepsico, Inc., Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-2259940), filed by Eagle Distributing of Texarkana, Inc..(Spivey, Patrick)
October 28, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Eagle Distributing of Texarkana, Inc. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document.If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eagle Distributing of Texarkana, Inc. v. Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel M. Janssen
Represented By: Zachary T Eastburn
Represented By: Nathan Oesch
Represented By: Andrew King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pepsico, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Wade
Represented By: Thomas Christoph Keller
Represented By: E. B. Chiles, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eagle Distributing of Texarkana, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Spivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?