Allen v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Christina Allen
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 4:2021cv04026
Filed: March 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Social Security Administration Commissioner's answer is due on 8/3/2021. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on May 27, 2021. (lmg)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jebby Rasputnis Office of Appellate Operations SSA)(Garrett, James)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christina Allen. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 4/5/2021, answer due 6/4/2021. (Giles, Greg)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mll)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Christina Allen. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (Giles, Greg)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to U. S. Attorney, Attorney General, Office of Regional Chief Counsel for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Giles, Greg)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #3 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Social Security Administration Commissioner. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on March 30, 2021. (mll)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 4/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Mag Consent). (mll)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , MOTION for Service by Christina Allen. (Giles, Greg)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Christina Allen.(Giles, Greg)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Christina Allen. Please proceed with filing your case initiating documents.If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Allen
Represented By: Greg R. Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Represented By: Office of Regional Counsel-Dallas
Represented By: James A. Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?