KB Components Plastunion AB v. Husqvarna Forestry Products N.A., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: KB Components Plastunion AB
Defendant: Husqvarna Forestry Products N.A., Inc. and Husqvarna Consumer Outdoor Products N.A., Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv04039
Filed: June 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Husqvarna Consumer Outdoor Products N.A., Inc. answer due 8/27/2021; Husqvarna Forestry Products N.A., Inc. answer due 8/27/2021. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 29, 2021. (mll)
July 27, 2021 Filing 14 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint (Joint) by Husqvarna Consumer Outdoor Products N.A., Inc., Husqvarna Forestry Products N.A., Inc.. (Wyatt, Thomas)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint Husqvarna Consumer Outdoor Products N.A., Inc. answer due 7/28/2021; Husqvarna Forestry Products N.A., Inc. answer due 7/28/2021. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 28, 2021. (mll)
June 28, 2021 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer #12 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney, who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Steven W. Quattlebaum. (mll)
June 25, 2021 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by Husqvarna Consumer Outdoor Products N.A., Inc., Husqvarna Forestry Products N.A., Inc.. (Wyatt, Thomas)
June 25, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas H. Wyatt on behalf of Husqvarna Consumer Outdoor Products N.A., Inc., Husqvarna Forestry Products N.A., Inc.. (Wyatt, Thomas)
June 25, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas H. Wyatt on behalf of Husqvarna Consumer Outdoor Products N.A., Inc., Husqvarna Forestry Products N.A., Inc.. (Wyatt, Thomas)
June 10, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by KB Components Plastunion AB. Husqvarna Consumer Outdoor Products N.A., Inc. served on 6/7/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. (Walker, Byron)
June 10, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by KB Components Plastunion AB. Husqvarna Forestry Products N.A., Inc. served on 6/5/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. (Walker, Byron)
June 7, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Smith on behalf of KB Components Plastunion AB. (Smith, Ryan)
June 3, 2021 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Husqvarna Consumer Outdoor Products N.A., Inc., Husqvarna Forestry Products N.A., Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mll)
June 3, 2021 Complaint filing fee paid re #2 Complaint : $ 402, receipt number BARWDC-2402732.. (Walker, Byron)
June 3, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 6/7/2021 (mll)
June 2, 2021 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mll)
June 2, 2021 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Husqvarna Consumer Outdoor Products for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Walker, Byron)
June 2, 2021 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Husqvarna Forestry Products for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Walker, Byron)
June 2, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by KB Components Plastunion AB.(Walker, Byron)
June 2, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by KB Components Plastunion AB. Please proceed with filing your case initiating documents.If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (mll)
June 2, 2021 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Plaintiff KB Components Plastunion AB. Complaint #2 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney, who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Ryan Smith. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KB Components Plastunion AB v. Husqvarna Forestry Products N.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Husqvarna Forestry Products N.A., Inc.
Represented By: Thomas H. Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Husqvarna Consumer Outdoor Products N.A., Inc.
Represented By: Thomas H. Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KB Components Plastunion AB
Represented By: Byron Jansen Walker
Represented By: Ryan Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?