Lacey v. Walker et al
Plaintiff: Xavier Juwen Lacey and Xavier Juwon Lacey
Defendant: Warden Jeffie Walker, Sheriff Jackie Runion, Sergeant Henderson, Transport Officer Nolund and Transport Officer Nolound
Case Number: 4:2021cv04088
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #6 Amended Complaint filed by Xavier Juwon Lacey. Objections to R&R due by 1/24/2022. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on January 6, 2022.(mll)
December 20, 2021 Filing 12 Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked Transported to ADC. Mail originally sent to Sheriff, Miller County at Miller County Detention Center including #9 Clerk's Order PLRA Fee. Resent to Warden, ADC - Ouachita River Unit. (mll)
December 20, 2021 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked Transported to ADC. Mail originally sent to Xavier Juwon Lacey at Miller County Detention Center including #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983), 8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983). Resent to ADC - Ouachita River Unit. (mll) Modified on 12/20/2021.(mll)
December 15, 2021 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ORDER directing Clerk to change the address for the Plaintiff to Ouachita River Unit of the Arkansas Department of Corrections. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on December 15, 2021. (cpg)
December 10, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Fee directing Miller County Detention Center to collect from petitioner's prison account monthly payments in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $350.00 filing fee is paid in full (cc: Sheriff, Miller County).(mll)
December 10, 2021 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983); and, granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. The Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $ 350. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on December 10, 2021. (cpg)
December 8, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Xavier Juwon Lacey. Motions referred to Barry A Bryant.(mll)
December 8, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sergeant Henderson, Jackie Runion, Jeffie Walker filed by Xavier Juwon Lacey.(mll) (Main Document 6 replaced on 12/13/2021)(mll).
November 19, 2021 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ORDER REGARDING COMPLAINT DEFICIENCY. After review of the Complaint, it is determined that the Plaintiff has not clearly stated how each named Defendant violated his federal constitutional rights, and some of his claims may be frivolous. For this reason, Plaintiff is directed to submit an Amended Complaint within 21 days of the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to mail the Plaintiff a court-approved 1983 form.In the Amended Complaint, Plaintiff must write short, plain statements telling the Court: the constitutional right Plaintiff believes was violated;the name of the Defendant who violated the right;exactly what the Defendant did or failed to do;how the action or inaction of that Defendant is connected to the violation of the constitutional rights;and what specific injury Plaintiff suffered because of the misconduct of that Defendant. See Rizzo v. Goode, 423 U.S. 362,371-72,377 (1976);Fed.R.Civ.P.8. Plaintiff must repeat this process for each person he has named as a Defendant. Plaintiff is CAUTIONED that he must affirmatively link the conduct of each named Defendant with the specific injury he suffered. If he fails to do so, the allegations against that Defendant will be dismissed for failure to state a claim.Plaintiff must clearly designate on the face of the document that it is a First Amended Complaint. The First Amended Complaint must be retyped or rewritten in its entirety on the court-approved form. You may not refer back to any part of the original complaint. A First Amended Complaint supersedes, or takes the place of, the original Complaint. After amendment, the Court will treat the original Complaint as nonexistent. Any cause of action that was raised in the original Complaint is waived if it is not raised in the First Amended Complaint. This case shall be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to return the Amended Complaint to the Court by the deadline. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP Amended Complaint due by 12/10/2021. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 19, 2021. (mlf)
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form.(mll)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the matter has been provisionally filed as the undersigned finds that additional information is needed to rule on Plaintiff's IFP application. Specifically the Court requires the following information: completed IFP. Failure to comply within the time period specified could result in summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order. Completed IFP due by 12/10/2021. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 18, 2021. (mll)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Xavier Juwen Lacey. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(mll)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Sergeant Henderson, Nolund, Jackie Runion, Jeffie Walker filed by Xavier Juwen Lacey.(mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lacey v. Walker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xavier Juwen Lacey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xavier Juwon Lacey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Jeffie Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Jackie Runion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transport Officer Nolund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transport Officer Nolound
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?