Hampton v. Tussey
Plaintiff: Bryan Hampton
Defendant: Terry Tussey, Jr
Case Number: 4:2022cv04002
Filed: January 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2022 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be held on or before 3/24/2022. JOINT Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 3/31/2022. Jury Trial set for 3/13/2023 in Texarkana -- 3rd flr (AR side) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 24, 2022. (rwg)
January 28, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Terry Tussey, Jr.(Potter, Joshua)
January 5, 2022 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Terry Tussey, Jr and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED.(mll)
January 5, 2022 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form.(mll)
January 5, 2022 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Terry Tussey, Jr. for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Sanford, Josh)
January 5, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Terry Tussey, Jr ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2520120), filed by Bryan Hampton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join -- Bryan Hampton)(Sanford, Josh)
January 5, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Bryan Hampton. Please proceed with filing your case initiating documents.If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated.(mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hampton v. Tussey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Hampton
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Tussey, Jr
Represented By: Joshua Landes Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?