Garner v. JBS Live Pork, LLC
Counter Defendant: Justin Garner
Counter Claimant: JBS Live Pork, LLC
Case Number: 4:2022cv04032
Filed: April 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to #3 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Justin Garner by JBS Live Pork, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Storti, John)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #3 Complaint. JBS Live Pork, LLC answer due 5/31/2022. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 26, 2022.(mll)
May 23, 2022 Filing 11 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 Complaint by JBS Live Pork, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Storti, John)
May 6, 2022 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint by JBS Live Pork, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Storti, John)
May 6, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Joseph Isert on behalf of JBS Live Pork, LLC. (Isert, Richard)
May 6, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Storti on behalf of JBS Live Pork, LLC. (Storti, John)
April 7, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Turner on behalf of Justin Garner. (Turner, Daniel)
April 7, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd M. Turner on behalf of Justin Garner. (Turner, Todd)
April 6, 2022 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to JBS Live Pork, LLC and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mll)
April 5, 2022 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to JBS Live Pork, LLC for service of the following document: #3 Complaint. (McGaha, Corey)
April 5, 2022 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against JBS Live Pork, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BARWDC-2571865), filed by Justin Garner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(McGaha, Corey)
April 5, 2022 Filing 2 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (cnn)
April 5, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Justin Garner. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed.A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garner v. JBS Live Pork, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Justin Garner
Represented By: Corey D. McGaha
Represented By: Daniel Turner
Represented By: Todd M. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: JBS Live Pork, LLC
Represented By: John P. Storti
Represented By: Richard Joseph Isert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?