Harris v. Easley et al
Plaintiff: Tyrone Harris
Defendant: Sheriff Wayne Easley, Brandon Yeley, Mason Roberts, Golden Adams, Richard Henderson, Southern Health Partners, Inc., Steven King, Kevin McCann and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 4:2023cv04086
Filed: September 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1443 Petition for Removal - Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2023 Filing 11 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 10/21/2024 @ 09:00 AM in Texarkana -- 3rd flr (AR side) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 31, 2023. (rwg)
October 27, 2023 Filing 10 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Tyrone Harris. (Sutter, Luther)
October 13, 2023 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southern Health Partners, Inc.. (McElroy, Jacob)
September 27, 2023 Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be conducted on or before 10/25/2023. JOINT Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 11/1/2023. Jury Trial set for 10/21/2024 in Texarkana -- 3rd flr (AR side) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 27, 2023. (rwg)
September 21, 2023 Notice of Removal fee received: $402, receipt number 2025627. (jlm)
September 20, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin D. Jackson on behalf of Steven King, Kevin McCann, Southern Health Partners, Inc.. (Jackson, Benjamin)
September 18, 2023 Filing 6 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form.(mll)
September 18, 2023 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Defendants Steven King, Kevin McCann, Southern Health Partners, Inc. Answer to Amended Complaint #4 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney, who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Benjamin D. Jackson.(mll)
September 11, 2023 Filing 5 STATE COURT ANSWER to #3 Second Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Golden Adams, Wayne Easley, Richard Henderson, Mason Roberts, Brandon Yeley.(mll)
September 11, 2023 Filing 4 STATE COURT ANSWER to #3 Second Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Steven King, Kevin McCann, Southern Health Partners, Inc.(mll)
September 11, 2023 Filing 3 STATE COURT SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Brandon Yeley, Richard Henderson, Southern Health Partners, Inc., John Does 1-10, Mason Roberts, Wayne Easley, Kevin McCann, Golden Adams, Steven King filed by Tyrone Harris.(mll)
September 11, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Miller County Circuit Court, case number 46CV-23-122 filed by Brandon Yeley, Richard Henderson, Mason Roberts, Wayne Easley, Golden Adams. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(mll)
September 11, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Tyrone Harris.(mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Easley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Harris
Represented By: Lucien R. Gillham
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Wayne Easley
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Yeley
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mason Roberts
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Adams
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Henderson
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Health Partners, Inc.
Represented By: Jacob McElroy
Represented By: Benjamin D. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven King
Represented By: Jacob McElroy
Represented By: Benjamin D. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McCann
Represented By: Jacob McElroy
Represented By: Benjamin D. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?