Stewart v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Paul Allen Stewart
Defendant: Captain Tracey Smith, Jail Administrator Gina Butler, Sheriff Bobby Walraven and Jailer Mike Bateman
Case Number: 4:2023cv04105
Filed: October 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Christy D Comstock
2 Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2023 Filing 15 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Reissued as to Mike Bateman and USM285 Form delivered to USMS for defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983), #4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #14 Order Directing Service.(mll) (Main Document 15 replaced on 12/19/2023) (mll).
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Mike Bateman and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on December 19, 2023. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service)(mll) Modified text on 12/20/2023 (lgd).
December 19, 2023 Filing 13 THE DOCUMENT IS FILED UNDER SEAL WITH THE COURT.SEALED DOCUMENT by Gina Butler, Tracey Smith, Bobby Walraven. An Order was entered on 12/14/2023 allowing the document(s) to be filed under seal. This docket entry is related to #12 Order to Show Cause. (Newell, Aaron)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Show Cause Response due by 12/29/2023 (See Order for Specifics). Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on December 14, 2023. (lgd)
December 8, 2023 Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Paul Allen Stewart as to Mike Bateman.(mll)
December 8, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) with Jury Demand by Gina Butler, Tracey Smith, Bobby Walraven.(Newell, Aaron)
December 7, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul Allen Stewart. Tracey Smith served on 11/16/2023, answer due 12/7/2023; Bobby Walraven served on 11/16/2023, answer due 12/7/2023.(mll)
December 4, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul Allen Stewart. Gina Butler served on 11/21/2023, answer due 12/12/2023.(mll)
November 13, 2023 TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case referral reassigned to Honorable Christy D. Comstock. Honorable Barry A Bryant no longer assigned to the case. (hnc)
November 2, 2023 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Mike Bateman, Gina Butler, Tracey Smith, Bobby Walraven and USM285 Forms delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983), #4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #6 Order Directing Service.(mll)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Mike Bateman, Gina Butler, Tracey Smith, Bobby Walraven and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on November 2, 2023. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service)(mll)
October 31, 2023 Filing 5 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Initial Fee directing Little River County Detention Center to collect from petitioner's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $43.08; thereafter to collect monthly payments from petitioner's prison account in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. (cc: Sheriff, Little River County)(mll)
October 31, 2023 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form.(mll)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. The Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $350.00. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on October 31, 2023.(mll)
October 31, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Paul Allen Stewart. Motions referred to Barry A Bryant.(mll)
October 31, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Mike Bateman, Gina Butler, Tracey Smith, Bobby Walraven filed by Paul Allen Stewart.(mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Allen Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Tracey Smith
Represented By: Aaron Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jail Administrator Gina Butler
Represented By: Aaron Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Bobby Walraven
Represented By: Aaron Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jailer Mike Bateman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?