Morris v. The Kansas City Southern Railway Company
Plaintiff: Gregory Don Morris
Defendant: The Kansas City Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 4:2024cv04077
Filed: July 22, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2024 Filing 10 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Gregory Don Morris. (Zito, Marc)
August 15, 2024 Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be conducted on or before 9/11/2024. JOINT Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 9/18/2024. Jury Trial set for 9/15/2025 in Texarkana -- 3rd flr (AR side) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 14, 2024. (rwg)
August 12, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE by Gregory Don Morris (Zito, Marc)
July 24, 2024 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Kansas City Southern Railway Company. (Wickes, Paul)
July 24, 2024 Filing 6 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by The Kansas City Southern Railway Company.(Wickes, Paul)
July 22, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly B. Tidwell on behalf of Gregory Don Morris. (Tidwell, Kelly)
July 22, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey P. Culbertson on behalf of Gregory Don Morris. (Culbertson, Geoffrey)
July 22, 2024 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form.(mll)
July 22, 2024 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against The Kansas City Southern Railway Company ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AARWDC-3019427), filed by Gregory Don Morris.(Zito, Marc)
July 22, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Gregory Don Morris. Please proceed with filing your case initiating documents.If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed.A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3).(mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. The Kansas City Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Don Morris
Represented By: Kelly B. Tidwell
Represented By: Geoffrey P. Culbertson
Represented By: Marc Zito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kansas City Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Paul O Wickes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?