Riley v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: Michael Edward Riley
Defendant: Special Agent John Jones, Investigator Jake Eudy and Chief Deputy Joey Davis
Case Number: 4:2024cv04130
Filed: December 20, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2025 ***TEXT ONLY ENTRY FOR ECF PURPOSES ONLY. (mjm)
February 10, 2025 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT to a District Judge. Case reassigned to presiding judge Honorable Susan O. Hickey and Honorable Barry A Bryant as the referral judge.(mll)
February 7, 2025 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE directed to Defendant(s). This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must return the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within twenty-one (21) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 2/28/2025. (mbm)
February 7, 2025 Filing 10 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Joey Davis, Jake Eudy, John Jones and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint (42:1983), filed by Michael Edward Riley; #1 Complaint (42:1983). (mbm)
February 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Joey Davis, Jake Eudy, John Jones and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on February 7, 2025. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified).(mbm)
February 7, 2025 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint (42:1983), filed by Michael Edward Riley. See R&R for details. Objections to R&R due by 2/24/2025. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on February 7, 2025. (mbm)
February 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SEVER CASE. Severed case number 4:25-cv-04008. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on February 5, 2025. (mbm)
January 24, 2025 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER denying #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel. A civil litigant does not have a constitutional or statutory right to appointed counsel in a civil action but the Court may appoint counsel at its discretion. 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(1). The Court has considered the need for an attorney, the likelihood that Plaintiff will benefit from assistance of counsel, the factual and legal complexity of the case, and whether Plaintiff has the ability to investigate and present this case. In considering these factors, the Court finds that the claims do not appear legally or factually complex, and Plaintiff is adequately prosecuting this case at this time. The Court finds Plaintiff is capable of prosecuting his claims without appointed counsel. At a later stage in the case, Plaintiff may again request appointment of counsel if Plaintiff believes the circumstances justify such an appointment. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on January 24, 2025. (awl)
January 23, 2025 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Michael Edward Riley. (ria)
December 20, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must return the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within twenty-one (21) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 1/10/2025. (bjb)
December 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). As Plaintiff is not longer incarcerated, no filing fee will be collected pursuant to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on December 20, 2024. (bjb)
December 20, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983), MOTION for Service by Michael Edward Riley. (bjb)
December 20, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (42:1983) against 9th West Judicial Circuit Court, 9th West Judicial Drug Task Force, Aaron Brassel, Bryan Chesshir, Tom Cooper, Joey Davis, Jake Eudy, Howard County Detention Center, Howard County Sheriff's Office, John Jones, Bryan McJunkins, Jana Tallent, filed by Michael Edward Riley.(bjb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riley v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Edward Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Special Agent John Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Investigator Jake Eudy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Deputy Joey Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?