Smith v. SSA Commissioner

Case Number: 5:2004cv05206
Filed: August 12, 2004
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
Presiding Judge: Beverly Stites Jones
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 17, 2006 14 Featured Case ORDER granting 10 Motion for Attorney Fees in the amount of $3440.28. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on April 17, 2006. (jn)
January 9, 2006 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re 10 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Sherry G Smith. (Brooks, Evelyn)
January 4, 2006 12 RESPONSE to Motion re 10 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Webb, Mark)
December 20, 2005 11 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of Request for EAJA Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act by Sherry G Smith. (Brooks, Evelyn)
December 20, 2005 10 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act by Sherry G Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum Opinion# 2 Exhibit Judgment# 3 Exhibit Timesheet# 4 Exhibit Consumer Price Index# 5 Request)(Brooks, Evelyn)
September 27, 2005 9 Featured Case ORDER REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY and reversing the decision of the Commissioner for further consideration pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Case dismissed. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on September 27, 2005. (cc: OHA & ALJ) (tg) Modified on 9/28/2005 to add cc: (jn).
September 27, 2005 8 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on September 27, 2005. (cc: OHA & ALJ) (tg) Modified on 9/28/2005 to add cc: (jn).
September 27, 2005 7 Featured Case ***INCORRECT ENTRY***ORDER REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY and reversing the decision of the Commissioner for further consideration pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on September 27, 2005. CASE DISMISSED (cc: ALJ, OHA)(tg) Modified on 9/27/2005 to correct attachment (jn).
January 7, 2005 6 SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL BRIEF by defendant SSA Commissioner (mfr)
November 3, 2004 5 SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL BRIEF by plaintiff Sherry G Smith (jn)
October 4, 2004 TRANSCRIPT OF SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEEDINGS filed by defendant SSA Commissioner (mfr)
October 4, 2004 4 ANSWER by defendant SSA Commissioner [1-1] (mfr)
August 26, 2004 3 Featured Case ORDER by Honorable Jimm L. Hendren w/ consent forms A attached, referring case to Magistrate Beverly S. Jones (cc: all counsel) (tg)
August 24, 2004 2 RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant SSA Commissioner on 8/18/04 (tg)
August 12, 2004 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished to pltf. (ct)
August 12, 2004 FILING FEE PAID: on 8/12/04 in the amount of $ 150.00, receipt # 66519. (ct)
August 12, 2004 1 COMPLAINT ( 4 summons(es) issued) (referred to Magistrate Beverly S. Jones ) (ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. SSA Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?