Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. v. Valueclick, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Defendant: VC E-Commerce Solutions, Inc. and Valueclick, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2005cv05189
Filed: November 22, 2005
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Benton
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 24, 2006 9
REPORT on the determination of an action re Trademark. See attached document for specifics. Copy of Judgment mailed to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks (mfr)
March 23, 2006 6
MOTION for Judgment Consent Judgment by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Hutchinson, W.)
March 22, 2006 5 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting plaintiff's 4 Motion to Extend time to effect service. Allowing plaintiff until 4/21/06 to serve defendants. Signed by Judge Robert T. Dawson on March 22, 2006. (ct)
March 21, 2006 4
MOTION to Extend Time by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Hutchinson, W.)
March 9, 2006 3
AMENDED COMPLAINT as to 1 Complaint, against VC E-Commerce Solutions, Inc., Valueclick, Inc. , filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.(ct)
November 23, 2005 2
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action re TRADEMARK See attached document for specifics. Copy of complaint mailed to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks (ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. v. Valueclick, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VC E-Commerce Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valueclick, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: W. Asa Hutchinson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?