Strange v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 5:2005cv05192
Filed: December 1, 2005
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
Presiding Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2007 *** TEXT ONLY ENTRY ***** MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT Case reassigned to Judge Barry A. Bryant. (Consent previously entered) (ct)
July 2, 2007 17 Featured Case ORDER granting 14 Motion for Attorney Fees in amount of $3,997.42 . Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on July 2, 2007. (ct)
June 28, 2007 16 RESPONSE to Motion re 14 MOTION for Attorney Fees Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
June 18, 2007 Judge Barry A. Bryant added. Judge James R. Marschewski no longer assigned to case. (ct)
June 18, 2007 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge James R. Marschewski for ruling on motion for attorney fees. (ct)
June 15, 2007 15 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support Request for Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act by Vicky L. Strange. (Brooks, Evelyn)
June 15, 2007 14 MOTION for Attorney Fees Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act by Vicky L. Strange. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (1) Memorandum Opinion# 2 Exhibit A (2) Judgement# 3 Exhibit B-Timesheet# 4 Errata C-Consumer Price Index)(Brooks, Evelyn)
March 22, 2007 13 Featured Case ORDER REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY pursuant to sentence four of 42 USC 405(g). Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on March 22, 2007. (cc: OHA & ALJ w/ Memorandum Opinion)(jn)
March 22, 2007 12 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on March 22, 2007. (jn)
March 31, 2006 11 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
March 2, 2006 10 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Vicky L. Strange. (Brooks, Evelyn)
March 2, 2006 9 ***DISREGARD ENTRY - INCORRECT EVENT USED***MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of Request for Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act by Vicky L. Strange. (Brooks, Evelyn) Modified on 3/3/2006 to show incorrect filing (jn).
February 1, 2006 8 Featured Case ORDER limiting appeal briefs to a maximum of 20 pages. Signed by Judge Bobby E. Shepherd on February 1, 2006. (bak)
February 1, 2006 7 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (bak)
January 30, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 3/1/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 3/31/2006. (cap)
January 25, 2006 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
January 10, 2006 5 MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT: Case reassigned to Judge Bobby E. Shepherd. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to the case. (mfr)
January 3, 2006 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Beverly Stites Jones. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on 1/3/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (plaintiff's consent); # 2 Exhibit (government's consent)(djm)
December 1, 2005 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, General Counsel of SSA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (jn)
December 1, 2005 3 Featured Case ORDER granting IFP application and directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of 11/21/05. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on November 29, 2005. (jn)
December 1, 2005 2 APPLICATION to proceed IFP by Plaintiff Vicky L. Strange. (jn)
December 1, 2005 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Vicky L. Strange. Filed nunc pro tunc as of 11/21/05(jn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strange v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?