McCarthy v. Mullins et al

Case Number: 5:2005cv05197
Filed: December 7, 2005
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 27, 2005 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Mail Returned, 5 Clerk's Order PLRA Fee and letter from law clerk Mail Returned. Clerk is directed to change plaintiff's address to 435 Marion Anderson Rd. Hot Springs, AR 71913 and also directs clerk to remain any returned pleadings or correspondence to that address.. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 12/27/05. (ct)
December 13, 2005 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to complete and sign the attached addendum to his complaint and return to the court by January 13, 2006 re 1 Complaint filed by Danny T. McCarthy. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on December 13, 2005. (tg)
December 8, 2005 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the clerk to collect the $250.00 filing fee.. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 12/8/05. (ct)
December 7, 2005 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing 1 Complaint by Danny T. McCarthy be filed, 2 and granting Application to proceed ifp. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 12/6/05. (ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCarthy v. Mullins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?