Johnson v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 5:2005cv05207
Filed: December 29, 2005
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2007 17 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Fees awarded to plaintiff, Pamela J. Johnson against defendant. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on August 2, 2007. (jn)
July 2, 2007 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 13 MOTION for Attorney Fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Pamela J. Johnson, Objections to R&R due by 7/19/2007. Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on July 2, 2007. (ct)
June 29, 2007 15 RESPONSE to Motion re 13 MOTION for Attorney Fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
June 19, 2007 Judge Barry A. Bryant added. Judge James R. Marschewski no longer assigned to case. (ct)
June 18, 2007 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge James R. Marschewski for ruling on attorney fees. (ct)
June 15, 2007 14 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of Request for Attoreny Fees and Costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act by Pamela J. Johnson. (Brooks, Evelyn)
June 15, 2007 13 MOTION for Attorney Fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act by Pamela J. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Jugement# 2 Exhibit B-Timesheet# 3 Exhibit C-Consumer Price Index)(Brooks, Evelyn)
March 23, 2007 12 JUDGMENT reversing decision of Commissioner and REMANDING CASE for further consideration pursuant to sentence 4. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on 3/23/07. cc: ALJ & OH&A(ct)
April 14, 2006 11 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
March 31, 2006 10 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Pamela J. Johnson. (Brooks, Evelyn)
March 30, 2006 9 ***DISREGARD ENTRY - INCORRECT EVENT USED*** MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of Request for Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act by Pamela J. Johnson. (Brooks, Evelyn) Modified on 3/31/2006 to show re-filing (jn).
February 28, 2006 8 Featured Case ORDER limiting appeal briefs to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Signed by Judge Bobby E. Shepherd on February 28, 2006. (bak)
February 28, 2006 7 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (bak)
February 28, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 3/30/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 5/1/2006. (cnn)
February 24, 2006 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
January 10, 2006 5 MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT: Case Reassigned to Judge Bobby E. Shepherd. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to the case. (mfr)
January 6, 2006 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Beverly Stites Jones. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on 1/6/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit-plaintiff's consent; # 2 Exhibit-government's consent)(djm)
December 29, 2005 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General and general counsel of Social Security and returned to attorney for service (ct)
December 29, 2005 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Application to proceed ifp filed by Pamela J. Johnson and directing that complaint be filed nunc pro tunc as of 12/15/05, . Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 12/28/05. (ct)
December 29, 2005 2 APPLICATION to proceed ifp by Plaintiff Pamela J. Johnson. (ct)
December 29, 2005 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed, nunc pro tunc as of 12/15/05, by Pamela J. Johnson.(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?