Cunningham v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 5:2006cv05088
Filed: May 18, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW Office
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2010 24 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Calvin L. Cunningham against Social Security Administration Commissioner in the amount of $4,837.58, and ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on July 20, 2010. (jas)
June 11, 2010 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 20 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Calvin L. Cunningham. Objections to R&R due by 6/28/2010. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on June 11, 2010. (tg)
June 8, 2010 22 RESPONSE to Motion re 20 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
June 2, 2010 CASE REFERRED to Honorable Barry A. Bryant. Motions referred to Honorable Barry A. Bryant.(src)
June 1, 2010 21 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act by Calvin L. Cunningham. (Brooks, Evelyn)
June 1, 2010 20 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act by Calvin L. Cunningham. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (1)-Report and Recommendation, # 2 Exhibit A (2)-Judgment, # 3 Exhibit B-Timesheet, # 4 Exhibit C-Consumer Price Index)(Brooks, Evelyn)
March 2, 2010 19 Featured Case ORDER REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on March 2, 2010. cc: ALJ & OH&A w/R&R(tg)
February 8, 2010 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Calvin L. Cunningham. Objections to R&R due by 2/25/2010. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on February 8, 2010. (jn)
August 4, 2009 17 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
July 6, 2009 16 Featured Case ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to File ( Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 8/5/2009). Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on July 6, 2009. (jn)
July 2, 2009 15 RESPONSE to Motion re 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Brief filed by Calvin L. Cunningham. (Brooks, Evelyn)
July 2, 2009 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Brief by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(Hawkins, Claude)
June 5, 2009 13 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Calvin L. Cunningham. (Brooks, Evelyn)
May 13, 2009 TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 6/12/2009. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on May 13, 2009. (lmg)
May 13, 2009 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (cap)
May 12, 2009 12 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
April 13, 2009 11 Featured Case ORDER granting 9 Motion to Reopen Case; ORDER REFERRING CASE to Honorable Barry A. Bryant. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on April 13, 2009. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(tg)
March 24, 2009 10 RESPONSE to Motion re 9 MOTION to Reopen Case filed by Calvin L. Cunningham. (Brooks, Evelyn)
March 24, 2009 9 MOTION to Reopen Case by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
January 23, 2007 8 Featured Case ORDER granting 6 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on January 23, 2007. (cc: OHA & ALJ)(tg) Modified on 1/24/2007 to add cc: (jn).
January 9, 2007 7 RESPONSE to Motion re 6 MOTION to Remand filed by Calvin L. Cunningham. (Brooks, Evelyn)
January 5, 2007 6 MOTION to Remand by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
November 15, 2006 5 Featured Case ORDER granting 4 Motion to Extend time for service for 60 days. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on November 15, 2006. (jn)
November 8, 2006 4 First MOTION to Extend Time for Service by Calvin L. Cunningham. (Brooks, Evelyn)
October 23, 2006 Judge Bobby E. Shepherd no longer assigned to case. (jrs)
June 7, 2006 Judge Bobby E. Shepherd added. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to case. (jn)
May 18, 2006 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (tg)
May 18, 2006 3 Featured Case ORDER re 2 Application to proceed IFP filed by Calvin L. Cunningham; 1 Complaint filed by Calvin L. Cunningham. The court grants motion to proceed IFP and directs the clerk to file the complaint nunc pro tunc as of May 15, 2006. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on May 16, 2006. (tg)
May 18, 2006 2 APPLICATION to proceed IFP by Plaintiff Calvin L. Cunningham. (tg)
May 18, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner filed by Calvin L. Cunningham to be filed nunc pro tunc as of May 15, 2006.(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunningham v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?