Caple v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 5:2006cv05117
Filed: June 27, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
Presiding Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 1, 2007 15 Featured Case ORDER denying 12 Motion for Attorney Fees . Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on November 1, 2007. (jn)
October 31, 2007 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re 12 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access for Justice Act filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
October 26, 2007 13 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support 12 motion for Attorney Fees Under EAJA by Charles Caple. (Brooks, Evelyn) Modified on 10/29/2007 to create link(ct).
October 26, 2007 12 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access for Justice Act by Charles Caple. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C)(Brooks, Evelyn)
May 30, 2007 11 JUDGMENT Reversing the decision of the Commissioner; REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY pursuant to Sentence 4, Civil Case Terminated. cc: ALJ & OH&A. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 5/30/07. (ct)
May 30, 2007 10 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 5/30/07. cc: ALJ & OH&A(ct)
January 4, 2007 MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT Case Reassigned to Judge James R. Marschewski. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to the case. (rls)
October 31, 2006 9 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
September 28, 2006 8 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Charles Caple. (Brooks, Evelyn)
September 1, 2006 7 Order Limiting Social Security Appeal Briefs of the parties to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on September 1, 2006. (jck)
September 1, 2006 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (jck)
August 31, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 10/2/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 10/30/2006. (mfr)
August 31, 2006 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
August 28, 2006 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. Docketed in error***This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 9/27/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 10/27/2006. (mfr) Modified on 8/28/2006 to add docket error information (mfr).
July 7, 2006 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Beverly Stites Jones. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on July 7, 2006. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit-plaintiff's consent; # 2 Exhibit-government's consent)(djm)
June 27, 2006 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (ct)
June 27, 2006 3 Featured Case ORDER directing that the clerk file the 1 Complaint by Charles Caple nunc pro tunc as of 6/23/06 and granting the 2 Application to proceed ifp filed by Charles Caple . Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 6/26/06. (ct)
June 27, 2006 2 APPLICATION to proceed ifp by Plaintiff Charles Caple. (ct)
June 27, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Charles Caple. Filed Nunc Pro Tunc as of 6/23/06(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caple v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?