Sisson v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 5:2006cv05144
Filed: August 3, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2007 18 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Angela R. Sisson against Social Security Administration Commissioner in amount of $3,848.22. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on December 4, 2007. (ct)
October 24, 2007 17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 14 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees filed by Angela R. Sisson, Objections to R&R due by 11/13/2007. Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on October 24, 2007. (ct)
October 18, 2007 16 RESPONSE to Motion re 14 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Jones Order)(Hawkins, Claude)
October 11, 2007 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Barry A. Bryant for ruling on attorney fees. Case previously referred to Judge Marschewski in error. (ct)
October 11, 2007 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge James R. Marschewski for ruling on attorney fees. (ct)
October 10, 2007 15 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 14 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees by Angela R. Sisson. (Cazort, Mildred)
October 10, 2007 14 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees by Angela R. Sisson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Judgment# 2 Exhibit B EAJA Billing# 3 Exhibit C Department of Labor CPI Report)(Cazort, Mildred)
July 12, 2007 13 JUDGMENT ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 12 , reversing decision of commissioner and remanding for further consideration pursuant to sentence four. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on July 12, 2007. cc: ALJ & OH&A w/copy of R&R(ct) Modified on 7/12/2007 to correct text(ct).
June 19, 2007 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Angela R. Sisson, Objections to R&R due by 7/6/2007. Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on June 19, 2007. (ct)
March 20, 2007 11 SUPPLEMENT by Defendant Social Security Administration Commissioner to 7 Appeal Brief (Social Security-Government). (Hawkins, Claude)
March 13, 2007 10 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Angela R. Sisson. (Cazort, Mildred)
February 20, 2007 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Barry A. Bryant. (tg)
January 23, 2007 9 Featured Case ORDER granting 8 Motion to Continue Appellant Brief due by 3/26/2007. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on 1/23/07. (ct)
January 22, 2007 8 First MOTION to Continue time for filing brief by Angela R. Sisson. (Cazort, Mildred)
January 19, 2007 7 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
November 21, 2006 TEXT ONLY Order Limiting Social Security Appeal Briefs of the parties to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation may be stricken from the record. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on November 21, 2006. (gg)
November 21, 2006 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief.. (gg)
November 21, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 12/21/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 1/22/2007. (mfr)
November 21, 2006 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
September 11, 2006 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (jn)
September 7, 2006 Judge Reassignment: Judge Bobby E. Shepherd added. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to case. (jn)
August 3, 2006 4 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis and directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of July 31, 2006. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on August 2, 2006. (tg)
August 3, 2006 3 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 2 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Angela R. Sisson. (tg)
August 3, 2006 2 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Angela R. Sisson. (tg)
August 3, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner filed by Angela R. Sisson. Filed nunc pro tunc 7/31/06. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of appeals council action)(tg) Modified on 8/7/2006 to add docket text (cap).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sisson v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?